FL S2510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-243, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-243, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the income threshold for certain contributions required by residents of veterans' nursing homes; establishing the Slots for Doctors Program for a specified purpose; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to implement a pilot program for individuals with developmental disabilities in specified Statewide Medicaid Managed Care regions to provide coverage of comprehensive services; requiring the agency to administer the pilot program in consultation with the Agency for Persons with Disabilities; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to give preference to certain plans, etc.
Title
Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#507 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Chapter No. 2023-243, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239) | |
2023-06-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-05 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2023-05-05 | House | Amendment 311896 adopted |
2023-05-05 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2023-05-05 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (311896) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2023-05-04 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Conference Committee on Appropriations: Broxson (Chair), Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/State Administration and Technology: Brodeur (Chair), Albritton, Berman, Boyd, DiCeglie, Garcia, Grall, Gruters, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Stewart, Trumbull, Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Criminal And Civil Justice/Justice: Bradley (Chair), Baxley, Burgess, Hooper, Ingoglia, Martin, Pizzo, Powell, Rouson, Torres, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/Higher Education: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Education/PreK-12: Perry (Chair), Avila, Book, Broxson, Burton, Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Thompson, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Conference Committee On Health And Human Services/Health Care: Harrell (Chair), Avila, Baxley, Book, Bradley, Brodeur, Burgess, Burton, Calatayud, Davis, Garcia, Gruters, Martin, Osgood, Rouson, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Conference Committee On Transportation, Tourism, And Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Hooper (Chair), Collins, DiCeglie, Grall, Perry, Polsky, Powell, Stewart, Thompson, Trumbull, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Conference Committee on Appropriations) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | In returning messages |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Amendment 707069 adopted |
2023-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Substituted for HB 5305 |
2023-04-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-03 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
H5003 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
H5305 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
H831 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
S1084 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
H5003 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
H5305 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
H831 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
S1084 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
296 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |