FL S7038 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming the Florida Domestic Security and Counter-Terrorism Intelligence Center as the Office of Domestic Security and Counterterrorism; renaming the Florida Domestic Security and Counter-Terrorism Database as the Domestic Security and Counterterrorism Database, etc.
Title
Department of Law Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security |