FL S7040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a sheriff to contract for services to provide training under the Coach Aaron Feis Guardian Program; adding penalties for persons who knowingly submit false information to a law enforcement agency; revising the training, consultation, and coordination responsibilities of the Office of Safe Schools; requiring the Louis de la Parte Florida Mental Health Institute to consult with specified state agencies and convene a workgroup to advise those agencies on the implementation of specified mental health recommendations, etc.
Title
Implementation of the Recommendations of the Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Public Safety Commission
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Senate Education Committee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7065 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1083 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1062 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7065 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1062 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7065 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 1493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 687 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |