FL S7052 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1267
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1267
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a participant has good cause for noncompliance with work requirements for a specified time period under certain circumstances; providing requirements for staff members of local workforce development boards when interviewing participants; requiring benefit management and career planning using a specified tool as part of the state's one-stop delivery system; requiring the Department of Commerce to develop certain training; authorizing certain participants to participate in certain programs or courses for a specified number of hours per week, etc.
Title
Economic Self-sufficiency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1267 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1267 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1267 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-240
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 0281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |