FL S7066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1311 (Ch. 2021-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1311 (Ch. 2021-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting discussions of certain confidential information by the Public Service Commission during certain hearings from public meetings requirements; requiring such hearings to be recorded by a certified court reporter; providing that only redacted transcripts are subject to public records requirements; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings/Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1311 (Ch. 2021-72) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1311 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/23/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Regulated Industries |
Same As/Similar To
H1311 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-72
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
286 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |