GA HB1015 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing a board of commissioners of roads and revenues for the County of Jenkins, approved August 1, 1911 (Ga. L. 1911, p. 449), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 3, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2960), an Act approved March 31, 1976 (Ga. L. 1976, p. 3643), and an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4984), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for terms of office and election; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jenkins County; board of commissioners; revise districts
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #683 - Local Calendar (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #683 - Local Calendar (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-27 | Act 425 | |
2012-03-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |