GA HB1015 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Montgomery County; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Montgomery County; Board of Elections and Registration; create
Sponsors
Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 614 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-02 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |