GA HB1016 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of South Fulton Public Facilities Authority; to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide for purpose and scope of operations of the authority; to provide for definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for moneys received and trust funds; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemption, rates, charges, and revenues; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for construction of this Act and severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of South Fulton Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Mandisha Thomas [D] | Rep. Lydia Glaize [D] | Rep. Tanya Miller [D] |
Rep. Inga Willis [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #491 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #423 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #423 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 637 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hopper |