GA HB1018 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 10 and 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to commerce and trade and crimes and offenses respectively, so as to provide for protections of persons who own, purchase, or engage in the business of selling firearms; to prohibit financial institutions from requiring the use of a firearms code that distinguishes firearms retailers from other retailers; to prohibit discrimination against firearms retailers by financial institutions through the use of a firearms code; to prohibit the disclosure of certain financial records by financial institutions; to provide for petitions to the Attorney General to investigate alleged violations; to prohibit persons or government entities from keeping registries of firearms or owners of firearms; to provide for construction; to provide definitions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Firearms Industry Nondiscrimination Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Sen. Carden Summers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #777 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #581 (Y: 106 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #581 (Y: 106 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 403 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hopper |