GA HB1023 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, exemptions, and credits relative to income taxes, so as to match the rate of the tax imposed on corporations to that imposed on individual taxpayers; to amend Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to specific, business, and occupation taxes, so as to repeal the corporate net worth tax; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; match tax rate imposed on corporations to that imposed on individual taxpayers
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #700 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 808, Hb 1023: Senate Vote #689 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #611 (Y: 138 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 808, Hb 1023: Senate Vote #689 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #611 (Y: 138 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-04-18 | Act 376 | |
2024-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hopper |