GA HB1054 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-13-2.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to signature on citations required, effect of failure to sign, exemption for out-of-state drivers, and electronic capture of signature, so as to provide for the issuance of refusal to sign citation; to provide for penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance of refusal to sign citation; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Yasmin Neal [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Kenneth Vance [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #509 (Y: 156 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House Hopper |