GA HB1079 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Holly Springs in the County of Cherokee, approved March 18, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3281), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3679), and an Act approved April 24, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 3648), so as to provide for the terms and manner of election of the mayor and councilmembers; to provide for posts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Holly Springs, City of; terms and manner of election of mayor and councilmembers; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #576 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Vote #609 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Vote #609 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 648 | |
2014-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Hopper |