GA HB1079 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 41 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abatement of nuisances generally, so as to provide for inclusion of claims against promoters and organizers for costs incurred by local governments due to unpermitted events in complaints filed on behalf of the public; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nuisances; provide for inclusion of claims against promoters and organizers for costs incurred by local governments due to unpermitted events in complaints filed on behalf of the public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66511 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/222438 |