GA HB1094 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Effective Date 2024-02-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Effective Date 2024-02-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners of Baldwin County, approved December 26, 1888 (Ga. L. 1888, p. 286), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 26, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 4786), so as to provide for staggered terms for the board of commissioners; to provide for initial terms; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Baldwin County; board of commissioners; provide staggered terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #506 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #440 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #440 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Effective Date 2024-02-19 | |
2024-02-19 | Act 364 | |
2024-02-19 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-02-19 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-08 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hopper |