GA HB1104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to address mental health risks for student athletes; to provide for mental health screenings in addition to or in conjunction with preparticipation physical examinations for student athletes; to provide for guidelines and other relevant materials to inform and educate public school and participating private school student athletes, their parents or guardians, school personnel, and coaches about screening student athletes for mental health risks and raising awareness of mental health resources available to student athletes; to provide for definitions; to provide for informational meetings; to require annual review by coaches; to provide for limited liability; to encourage additional implementation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; address mental health risks for student athletes
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Cox [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #778 (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #623 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #623 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hopper |