GA HB1118 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Port Wentworth, and to grant a charter to said city, approved February 6, 1957 (Ga. L. 1957, p. 2003), as amended, so as to change the compensation of the mayor and council; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Port Wentworth, City of; change compensation of mayor and council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 652 | |
2014-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House Hopper |