GA HB1118 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the filling of vacancies on the Washington County Hospital Authority; to provide for the filling of vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Washington County Hospital Authority; filling of vacancies; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 515 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House Hopper |