GA HB1122 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Oglethorpe County; to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for the composition of the board and the selection and appointment of members and an elections supervisor; to provide for the qualifications, terms, and removal of members; to provide for vacancies; to provide for oaths and privileges; to provide for the conduct of primaries and elections; to provide for meetings; to authorize the conduct of municipal elections; to allow for joint primaries; to authorize expenditure of public funds; to provide compensation for board members; to provide for offices, supplies, and other materials; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oglethorpe County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 576 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House Hopper |