GA HB1136 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Rome, approved August 19, 1918 (Ga. L. 1918, p. 813), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 16, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 4188), an Ordinance adopted by the Rome City Commission June 15, 1987 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 5404), an Ordinance adopted by the Rome City Commission August 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 4849), and an Ordinance adopted by the Rome City Commission September 3, 2002 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4756), so as to change qualifications for members of the governing authority to include residency in the ward in which they seek office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rome, City of; residency qualifications for members of the governing authority; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #655 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #739 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #739 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 587 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-14 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Hopper |