GA HB1138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-10-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fund administrator and investments relative to the Invest Georgia Fund, so as to provide for an additional factor that the fund administrator shall consider in the selection of venture capital funds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Invest Georgia Fund; provide additional factor that the fund administrator shall consider in the selection of venture capital funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #583 (Y: 146 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66694 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/222962 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66694#23057 |