GA HB1150 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Wayne County, approved March 6, 1962 (Ga. L. 1962, p. 3110), as amended, so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for election, terms of office, and qualifications of members; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for a contingent repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wayne County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Lane [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Tommy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Vote #690 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1214 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Vote #690 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1214 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-27 | Act 427 | |
2012-03-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-13 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-27 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House First Readers |