GA HB1150 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 41-1-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to treatment of agricultural facilities and operations and forest land as nuisances, so as to provide for legislative intent; to remove a definition; to limit the circumstances under which agricultural facilities and operations may be sued for a nuisance; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Freedom to Farm Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #871 (Y: 106 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #790 (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #602 (Y: 102 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #790 (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #602 (Y: 102 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-13 | Act 598 | |
2022-04-13 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |