GA HB1173 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-4-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fishing with bow and arrow, so as to authorize taking channel catfish and flathead catfish by bow and arrow state wide; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; authorize taking channel catfish and flathead catfish by bow and arrow state wide
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] | Rep. Charles Cannon [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66763 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223158 |