GA HB121 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to require notice of write-in candidacy filings to include an authorization by the candidate if such filings are not done by the candidate; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; write-in candidacy filings to include authorization by candidate if not done by candidate; require notice
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House Vote #62 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43030 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/146006 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43030#12243 |