GA HB1230 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Edison, approved May 3, 2021 (Ga. L. 2021, p. 3751), so as to authorize the municipal court to collect a technology fee; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Edison, City of; municipal court to collect a technology fee; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #580 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #498 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #498 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective Date 2024-05-01 | |
2024-05-01 | Act 529 | |
2024-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |