GA HB128 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-85.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates for veterans, so as to provide for a special license plate for veterans of Operation Enduring Freedom and Operation Iraqi Freedom; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Operation Enduring Freedom and Operation Iraqi Freedom veterans; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Rashad Taylor [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - House Vote #29 - Attendance (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-02 | House First Readers |