GA HB128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding health, so as to prohibit providers from discriminating against potential organ transplant recipients due solely to the physical or mental disability of the potential recipient; to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance generally, so as to prohibit health insurers from discriminating against potential organ transplant recipients due solely to the physical or mental disability of the potential recipient; to provide for definitions; to provide for health benefit plans and collective bargaining; to provide for applicability; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gracie's Law; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Danny Mathis [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am: House Vote #375 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #335 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #49 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #335 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #49 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 244 | |
2021-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hopper |