GA HB1283 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding the juvenile code, so as to revise a provision relating to the use of a deadly weapon; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile code; use of deadly weapon; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Holt Persinger [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Charles Cannon [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #598 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67074 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224159 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67074#23097 |