GA HB1284 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 22 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 and Code Section 40-6-163 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to school buses for elementary and secondary education and duty of driver of vehicle meeting or overtaking school bus, reporting of violations, and civil monetary penalty for violations captured by school bus camera, respectively, so as to provide suggested standards for the establishment of school bus routes; to enhance the penalties for meeting or overtaking a school bus; to provide for notification to insurance carriers upon issuance of a second or subsequent civil monetary penalty for such violations; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; establishment of school bus routes; provide suggested standards
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Daniel [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Kenneth Vance [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Hopper |