GA HB1296 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Toccoa to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Toccoa, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 552 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House First Readers |