GA HB1329 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to authorize and provide for the regulation and taxation of fantasy contests in this state; to provide for additional powers and duties of the Georgia Lottery Corporation; to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to gambling, so as to exclude any consideration paid to a fantasy contest operator licensee from the definition of "bet"; to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to exempt entry fees for fantasy contests; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; regulation and taxation of fantasy contests; authorize and provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |