GA HB137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for crimes and offenses, so as to change provisions relating to restrictions on contingency fee compensation of an attorney appointed to represent the state in forfeiture actions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; restrictions on contingency fee compensation of an attorney appointed in forfeiture actions; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #220 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House Hopper |