GA HB193 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 25 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to life insurance, so as to provide for the "Life Insurance Consumer Disclosure Model Act"; to provide for written notice to certain life insurance policyholders that request the surrender of, a loan against, or accelerated death benefit, nursing home benefit, critical illness benefit, or any other living benefit under a life insurance policy; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for the written notice provisions; to provide that the written notice shall be promulgated by rules and regulations by the Commissioner; to provide for penalties; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Life Insurance Consumer Disclosure Model Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Vote #522 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Vote #522 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 357 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House Hopper |