GA HB248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-14-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to enforcement of speed limit in school zones with recorded images, civil monetary penalty, and vehicle registration and transfer of title restrictions for failure to pay penalty, so as to authorize a local governing body to apply for a permit to operate a traffic enforcement safety device which enforces the speed limit in a school zone by recorded image; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; local governing body to apply for a permit to operate a traffic enforcement safety device which enforces the speed limit in a school zone by recorded image; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #138 (Y: 133 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59234 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196537 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59234#18303 |