GA HB248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 16 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding sheriffs, so as to repeal provisions limiting sheriffs to one additional salary for serving as the sheriff of multiple courts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; limiting sheriffs to one additional salary for serving as sheriff of multiple courts; repeal provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Rep. Lehman Franklin [R] | Rep. Bill Yearta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House Hopper |