GA HB252 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend various titles of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to enact the "J. Calvin Hill, Jr., Act"; to repeal obsolete and outdated provisions; to repeal provisions which have been deemed unconstitutional; to update obsolete and outdated terminology; to repeal certain provisions relating to preclearance requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
J. Calvin Hill, Jr., Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #222 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #110 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #110 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 70 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |