GA HB253 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Jones County Public Facilities Authority; to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide for purpose and scope of operations of the authority; to provide for definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for moneys received and trust funds; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemption, rates, charges, and revenues; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for construction of this Act and severability; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jones County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #126 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #103 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #103 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 54 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |