GA HB305 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to remove a participation requirement before the extension of group life policy coverage to dependents of employees or members; to provide cash surrender values of annuities are exempt from claims of creditors; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; group life policy coverage; remove participation requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Knox [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #193 - Pass (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #193 - Pass (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | House Insists | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Insists | |
2010-04-27 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-05 | House First Readers |