GA HB336 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 36, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, revenue and taxation, and state government, respectively, so as to provide for broadband deployment incentives; to provide for definitions; to establish certification of certain counties and municipal corporations as broadband ready communities; to provide for duties and responsibilities of the Department of Economic Development; to provide for the Georgia Technology Authority to develop an annual "Broadband Strategy for All of Georgia" report providing guidance for achieving enhanced broadband deployment throughout this state; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Broadband Strategy for All of Georgia Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] |
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Hopper |