GA HB385 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to State Commission on Family Violence, so as to repeal the date on which the commission shall cease to exist; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Commission on Family Violence; date which commission cease to exist; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Cecily Hill [R] | Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Bobby Parham [D] |
Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Tommy Smith [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #155 - Pass (Y: 149 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House First Readers |