GA HB468 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a homestead exemption from certain DeKalb County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of such homestead, approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4636), as amended, so as to modify the time limitation on such exemption; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; ad valorem tax; modify time limitation on homestead exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50928 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/166308 |