GA HB468 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency powers of the governor, so as to provide for the continued operation of businesses during a public health state of emergency if they comply with certain health and safety measures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Governor; continued operation of businesses during a public health state of emergency if they comply with certain health and safety measures; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hopper |