GA HB524 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-490 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration of businesses using trade names, so as to require registration of trade names with the clerk of superior court; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to clerks of superior courts, so as to establish a trade name registry; to provide for duties of clerks of superior courts; to provide for fees; to correct cross-references; to provide for an automatic repeal; to provide for revised fees on and after January 1, 2021; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trade names; require registration with clerk of superior court; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #337 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #423 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #198 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #423 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #198 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V5 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House Hopper |