GA HB527 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state, county, and municipal road systems, so as to authorize procedures relative to asbestos pipe; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Road systems; asbestos pipe; authorize procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House First Readers |