GA HB609 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the Board of Commissioners of Taylor County, approved March 1, 1933 (Ga. L. 1933, p. 672), as amended, so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to define certain terms and provide for certain inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taylor County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #239 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 282 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House Hopper |