GA HB674 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-12-60, relating to regulation of bingo games operated by nonprofit organizations, so as to remove the limits on the amounts of prizes which may be awarded in such games; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bingo games; limits on amounts of prizes; remove
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #283 - Pass (Y: 107 N: 54 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House First Readers |