GA HB674 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the State Court of Catoosa County; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Catoosa County; State Court; create
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 48 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Hopper |