GA HB775 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the control of hazardous conditions, preventable diseases, and metabolic disorders, so as to provide for restrictions on the sale and dispensing of spectacles; to provide for definitions; to provide for violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; restrictions on sale and dispensing of spectacles; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #613 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 615 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-20 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-15 | House | House Hopper |