GA HB783 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a new charter for the Town of Moreland, approved March 28, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 5053), as amended, so as to repeal provisions related to the Recorder's Court; to establish a municipal court; to provide for judges of such court; to provide for convening, jurisdiction, and powers of such court; to provide for appeals; to provide for rules of court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Moreland, Town of; Recorder's Court; repeal provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #338 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 320 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |