GA HB786 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Dalton ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in the amount of $150,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city who are 70 years of age or over, approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 3766), so as to increase such exemption; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dalton, City of; ad valorem tax; municipal purposes; increase homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 322 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-31 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |